CT SJ00195 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Pedro E. Segarra Of Hartford To Be A Judge Of The Superior Court.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Pedro E. Segarra Of Hartford To Be A Judge Of The Superior Court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 22 (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 11 (Y: 125 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 11 (Y: 125 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2024-03-25 | House | Adopted, House |
2024-03-25 | House | Rules Suspended |
2024-03-25 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 32 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Judiciary |