DC B20-0521 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-28 - Act A20-0471 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12112
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-28 - Act A20-0471 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12112
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
N Street Village Way 2013
Title
N Street Village Way 2013
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-10-28 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-28 | Council | Act A20-0471 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12112 |
2014-11-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-11-10 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0471 |
2014-11-03 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Nov 18, 2014 |
2014-10-28 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2014-10-07 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2014-09-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2014-09-23 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0521 |
2014-07-02 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0521 |
2014-05-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-10-15 | Council | Referred to Committee of the Whole |
2013-10-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0521 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-10-01 | Council | B20-0521 Introduced by Councilmember Evans at Office of the Secretary |