DC B20-0572 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-05 - Act A20-0484 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12403
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-05 - Act A20-0484 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12403
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commission On Health Disparities Establishment Act Of 2013
Title
Commission On Health Disparities Establishment Act Of 2013
Sponsors
Cnc. Yvette Alexander [D] | Cnc. Marion Barry [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. David Catania [D] |
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Vincent Orange [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-10-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - Amendment #1 & 2 (Alexander) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-07 - Council - Amendment (Alexander) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - Amendment #1 & 2 (Alexander) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-07 - Council - Amendment (Alexander) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-05 | Council | Act A20-0484 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12403 |
2014-11-24 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-11-21 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0484 |
2014-11-12 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Nov 26, 2014 |
2014-10-28 | Council | Amendment (Alexander) - Accepted as friendly |
2014-10-07 | Council | Amendment (Alexander) |
2014-09-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0572 |
2014-05-30 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0572 |
2014-05-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-11-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0572 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-11-05 | Council | B20-0572 Introduced by Councilmembers Alexander, Barry, Bonds, Catania, Grosso, Orange, and McDuffie, and Chairman Mendelson at Legislative Meeting |