DC B20-0595 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-30 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-30 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public-private Partnership Act Of 2013
Title
Public-private Partnership Act Of 2013
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-30 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-12-29 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0550 |
2014-12-22 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 7, 2015 |
2014-12-02 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) |
2014-10-28 | Council | First Reading CC |
2014-10-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2014-10-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0595 |
2014-06-12 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0595 |
2014-05-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-12-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0595 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-12-03 | Council | B20-0595 Introduced by Councilmembers Bowser and Grosso at Legislative Meeting |