DC B20-0757 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-02 - Act A20-0531 Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-02 - Act A20-0531 Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wage Transparency Amendment Act Of 2014
Title
Wage Transparency Amendment Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Second Reconsideration (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Second Reconsideration (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-02 | Council | Act A20-0531 Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 9 |
2014-12-23 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-12-19 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0531 |
2014-12-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 30, 2014 |
2014-12-02 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2014-11-18 | Council | First Reading CC |
2014-11-12 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0757 |
2014-06-23 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0757 |
2014-05-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-04-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0757 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-04-08 | Council | B20-0757 Introduced by Councilmembers McDuffie, Bonds, Cheh, Grosso, Wells, Alexander, Bowser, Graham, and Orange, and Chairman Mendelson at Legislative Meeting |