DC B20-0790 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-17 - Amendment (Wells)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-17 - Amendment (Wells)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reproductive Health Non-discrimination Amendment Act Of 2014
Title
Reproductive Health Non-discrimination Amendment Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Council - Amendment (Wells) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Council - Amendment (Wells) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Council | Amendment (Wells) |
2014-12-02 | Council | Postponed until December 16, 2014 |
2014-10-28 | Council | First Reading CC |
2014-10-15 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0790 |
2014-06-23 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0790 |
2014-05-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-05-16 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0790 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-05-06 | Council | B20-0790 Introduced by Councilmembers Grosso, Wells, McDuffie, Bowser, Alexander, Barry, Bonds, Catania, Cheh, Graham, and Orange at Legislative Meeting |