DC B20-0995 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pepco Cost-sharing Fund For Dc Plug Establishment Temporary Act Of 2014
Title
Pepco Cost-sharing Fund For Dc Plug Establishment Temporary Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-12-23 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0537 |
2014-12-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 30, 2014 |
2014-12-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2014-11-18 | Council | First Reading |
2014-11-14 | Council | B20-0995 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |