DC B20-1014 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-26 - Act A20-0524 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 13112, Expires on Mar 18, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-26 - Act A20-0524 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 13112, Expires on Mar 18, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Metropolitan Police Department Commencement Of Discipline And Command Staff Appointment Emergency Amendment Act Of 2014
Title
Metropolitan Police Department Commencement Of Discipline And Command Staff Appointment Emergency Amendment Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Cnc. Tommy Wells [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-26 | Council | Act A20-0524 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 13112, Expires on Mar 18, 2015 |
2014-12-19 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-12-18 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0524, Expires on Mar 18, 2015 |
2014-12-16 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2014-12-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 23, 2014 |
2014-12-02 | Council | B20-1014 Introduced by Councilmember Wells at Office of the Secretary |