DC B21-0331 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-21 - Law Number L21-0157 Effective from October 8, 2016, Projected Law Date is October 8, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-21 - Law Number L21-0157 Effective from October 8, 2016, Projected Law Date is October 8, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 21-157 establishes a minimum work week for building service employees of 30 hours provided that certain requirements are met including up to twenty percent of work hours for employees engaged in cleaning may be preserved for part-time employees with a minimum shift of four hours per night and twenty hours per week per employee. It establishes a posting requirement for employers to post in a conspicuous place, a notice that sets forth the pertinent provisions of the legislation. It establishes civil penalties for noncompliance of not more than $5,000 and administrative penalties of not more than $1,000. An employee can request administrative enforcement of this legislation via a signed complaint for failure to provide a minimum work week filed no later than 3 years after the last date upon which the violation occurred. After exhausting all administrative remedies, an aggrieved employee may bring a civil action in DC Superior Court.
Title
Building Service Employees Minimum Work Week Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. LaRuby May [D] | Cnc. Vincent Orange [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-07-12 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-21 | Council | Law Number L21-0157 Effective from October 8, 2016, Projected Law Date is October 8, 2016 |
2016-08-26 | Council | Act A21-0485 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 10739 |
2016-08-24 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is October 8, 2016 |
2016-08-18 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0485 |
2016-08-18 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0485 |
2016-08-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 22, 2016 |
2016-07-12 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-06-28 | Council | First Reading |
2016-06-23 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-06-23 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0331 |
2016-01-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2015-12-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2015-07-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0331 Published in the DC Register |
2015-07-14 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business, Consumer, and Regulatory Affairs |
2015-07-14 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |