DC B21-0380 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires the personnel authority to enroll new hires into the District's deferred compensation program. The bill specifies that the employee's contribution level to the program shall be 5% of base salary; that the employee has the right to modify or terminate contributions to the program; and that the bill shall have no effect on existing collective bargaining agreements although the enrollment of an employee in the program shall be considered a management right.
Title
Deferred Compensation Program Enrollment Amendment Act Of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-25 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-10-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2015-10-02 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0380 Published in the DC Register |
2015-09-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2015-09-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B21-0380 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/34519/B21-0380-Introduction.pdf |