DC B21-0515 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-27 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-27 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill expands the time individuals utilizing Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) may receive benefits. Circumstances include parents and caretakers who have received benefits for more than 60 months but qualify for hardship exemptions or extensions and children of those individuals; those caring for the physically or mentally incapacitated; those complying with their Individual Responsibility Plan; a lack of employment opportunities within the District; those affected by significant barriers to employment; individuals that are homeless or children currently in foster care; and pregnant or parenting teens. The bill requires the Mayor to create rules to support its provisions, inform recipients of its provisions, and standardize processes by which to determine and re-determine eligibility of each TANF recipient.
Title
District Of Columbia Public Assistance Amendment Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Cnc. LaRuby May [D] | Cnc. Vincent Orange [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-10-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2015-12-04 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0515 Published in the DC Register |
2015-12-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-12-01 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B21-0515 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/34955/B21-0515-Introduction.pdf |