DC B21-0580 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill redefines the term "restricted use pesticides" to include materials that contain a carcinogenic or likely to be carcinogenic material. The bill permits the District Department of the Environment (DDOE) to reclassify materials based on the findings of state, national, international government bodies, or non-governmental organizations. Finally, the bill permits the DDOE to issue additional restrictions not specifically expressed in District law.
Title
Pesticide Education And Control Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. LaRuby May [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-20 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017 |
2016-12-20 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-12-06 | Council | First Reading CC |
2016-11-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-11-29 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0580 |
2016-10-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-10-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-01-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0580 Published in the DC Register |
2016-01-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2016-01-19 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |