DC B21-0641 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Law Number L21-0123 Effective from June 17, 2016, Expires on January 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Law Number L21-0123 Effective from June 17, 2016, Expires on January 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting Normalcy And Empowering Children In Foster Care Temporary Amendment Act Of 2016
Title
Supporting Normalcy And Empowering Children In Foster Care Temporary Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Council | Law Number L21-0123 Effective from June 17, 2016, Expires on January 28, 2017 |
2016-05-06 | Council | Act A21-0377 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 6866 |
2016-05-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2016-04-27 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0377 |
2016-04-27 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0377 |
2016-04-12 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 27, 2016 |
2016-04-05 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-03-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0641 Published in the DC Register |
2016-03-01 | Council | First Reading |
2016-03-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-02-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |