DC B21-0711 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-26 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-26 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill amends an act that addresses the issue of worker protections when an employer does not fully compensate an employee for work performed. It clarifies that the Office of Administrative Hearings has jurisdiction over all administrative hearings. It also includes changes to business record keeping protocol and access. It amends the minimum wage law notice requirements by allowing electronic acknowledgement from an employee to be sufficient. Among other things, it attempts to put lower limits on the amount of attorney fees that a prevailing plaintiff may be awarded.
Title
Wage Theft Prevention Revision Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-09-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-05-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business, Consumer, and Regulatory Affairs |
2016-04-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0711 Published in the DC Register |
2016-04-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B21-0711 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/35659/B21-0711-Introduction.pdf |