DC B21-0806 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-28 - Law Number L21-0163 Effective from October 13, 2016, Expires on May 26, 2017, Projected Law Date is October 13, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-28 - Law Number L21-0163 Effective from October 13, 2016, Expires on May 26, 2017, Projected Law Date is October 13, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Grocery Store Restrictive Covenant Prohibition Temporary Act Of 2016
Title
Grocery Store Restrictive Covenant Prohibition Temporary Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-07-12 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-28 | Council | Law Number L21-0163 Effective from October 13, 2016, Expires on May 26, 2017, Projected Law Date is October 13, 2016 |
2016-08-30 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is October 13, 2016 |
2016-08-05 | Council | Act A21-0469 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 10164 |
2016-07-21 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0469 |
2016-07-21 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0469 |
2016-07-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 29, 2016 |
2016-07-12 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-07-12 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-06-28 | Council | First Reading |
2016-06-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |