DC B21-0813 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill makes changes to the authority of the Inspector General. It includes provisions authorizing the Office of the Inspector General (Office) to hire, retain, and terminate personnel within the Office as well as independently exercise procurement authority; permits criminal investigators within the Office to arrest without a warrant in certain circumstances; reclassifies the Office as an independent agency within the District government; and requires District governmental agencies to provide notice and coordinate with the Office during investigations of District government employees and contractors.
Title
Comprehensive Inspector General Independence And Empowerment Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-25 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-10-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-07-12 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2016-07-01 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0813 Published in the DC Register |
2016-06-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B21-0813 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/36178/B21-0813-Introduction.pdf |