DC B21-0824 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-26 - Act A21-0482, Expires on November 16, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 10728
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-26 - Act A21-0482, Expires on November 16, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 10728
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
First Amendment To The Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Multi-jurisdiction Capital Funding Agreement Emergency Act Of 2016
Title
First Amendment To The Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Multi-jurisdiction Capital Funding Agreement Emergency Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-12 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-26 | Council | Act A21-0482, Expires on November 16, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 10728 |
2016-08-18 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0482 |
2016-08-18 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0482 |
2016-08-04 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 18, 2016 |
2016-07-12 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-07-12 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-07-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |