DC B21-0876 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-28 - Act A21-0506, Expires on January 17, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 13348
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-28 - Act A21-0506, Expires on January 17, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 13348
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus Sursum Corda Development Emergency Act Of 2016
Title
Omnibus Sursum Corda Development Emergency Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-28 | Council | Act A21-0506, Expires on January 17, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 13348 |
2016-10-19 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0506 |
2016-10-19 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0506 |
2016-10-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-10-05 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 20, 2016 |
2016-09-20 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-09-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |