DC B21-0904 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-25 - Act A21-0530, Expires on February 16, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 14334
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-25 - Act A21-0530, Expires on February 16, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 14334
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tipping contract with Maru Solutions Incorporated
Leg. agenda 11/1/2016
Title
Modifications To Contract No. Cw28295 Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-25 | Council | Act A21-0530, Expires on February 16, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 14334 |
2016-11-18 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0530 |
2016-11-18 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0530 |
2016-11-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 22, 2016 |
2016-11-01 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-10-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-10-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |