DC B21-0914 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act A21-0527, Expires on January 29, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 13609
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act A21-0527, Expires on January 29, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 13609
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Access To Emergency Epinephrine In Schools Clarification Emergency Amendment Act Of 2016
Title
Access To Emergency Epinephrine In Schools Clarification Emergency Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-11 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | Council | Act A21-0527, Expires on January 29, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 13609 |
2016-10-31 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0527 |
2016-10-31 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0527 |
2016-10-18 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-10-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 31, 2016 |
2016-10-11 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-10-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |