DC B22-0196 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes what entities are authorized to administer an epinephrine auto-injector to individuals experiencing anaphylaxis and allows licensed physicians to prescribe the epinephrine auto-injectors to authorized entities. Agents of the authorized entities must be acting in good faith and must have completed a training program conducted by a nationally recognized organization experienced in training laypersons in emergency health treatment. It also provides immunity from civil and criminal liability to health care professionals who prescribe and agents of an authorized entity who provide or administer an epinephrine auto-injector.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Access To Treatment For Anaphylaxis Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-16 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019 |
2018-11-09 | Council | Act A22-0506 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12365 |
2018-10-31 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0506 |
2018-10-31 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0506 |
2018-10-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 6, 2018 |
2018-10-16 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-10-02 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-09-21 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-09-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0196 |
2018-01-17 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-01-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0196 |
2017-09-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-08-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0196 Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2017-03-21 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |