DC B22-0806 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-11 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-11 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes within the Mayor's Office of Veterans Affairs a Veterans Emergency Food Program to provide veterans and their families, who are in a short-term crisis, access to food.
Title
Veterans Emergency Food Program Act Of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-05-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-05-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0806 Published in the DC Register |
2018-05-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-01 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0806 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/40184/B22-0806-Introduction.pdf |