DC B22-0979 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Act A22-0546 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 216
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revised Transfer Of Jurisdiction Over U.s. Reservation 724 (lots 896 And 897 Within Square 620) Act Of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revised Transfer Of Jurisdiction Over U.s. Reservation 724 (lots 896 And 897 Within Square 620) Act Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-20 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-11CouncilAct A22-0546 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 216
2019-01-09CouncilTransmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019
2018-12-26CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0546
2018-12-26CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0546
2018-12-13CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 28, 2018
2018-12-04CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-11-26CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-11-20CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0979
2018-11-20CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-10-23CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2018-10-05CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2018-10-05CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0979 Published in the DC Register
2018-10-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2018-09-21CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback