DC B23-0082 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it allows persons seeking to discharge delinquent debt of $100 or more from the commission of a traffic infraction to participate in a deferred payment plan. It also allows for appeals of decisions denying access to a deferred payment plan to be appealed to the Office of Administrative Hearings.
Provisions of Bill 22-488 have been incorporated.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Ticket Payment Plan Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-01-28 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0082 |
2019-09-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-09-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-01-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0082 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2019-01-22 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0082 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41714/Introduction/B23-0082-Introduction.pdf |