DC B23-0126 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Law L23-0112, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8973
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Law L23-0112, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8973
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 23-112 requires a voter registration packet posted on the Board of Elections website. It requires the District of Columbia Housing Finance Agency and landlords of residential rental properties to provide voter registration materials to tenants. It also requires that an application for the homestead deduction for houses, condos, and cooperative housing associations include a voter registration packet.
Title
Improving Voter Registration for New Tenants and Homeowners Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - Council - Amendment #1 (Allen) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - Council - Amendment #1 (Allen) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-24 | Council | Law L23-0112, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8973 |
2020-05-15 | Council | Act A23-0304 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5066 |
2020-05-12 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-05-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-04-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0304 |
2020-04-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 1, 2020 |
2020-04-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-04-07 | Council | Amendment #1 (Allen) |
2020-03-03 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-02-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-02-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0126 |
2019-06-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-05-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0126 Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-02-05 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |