DC B23-0159 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Act A23-0031 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4010, Expires on Jun 25, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Act A23-0031 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4010, Expires on Jun 25, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 3 and 4 to Contract No. DCAM-17-CS-0025B with Micon Construction, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019
Title
Modification Nos. 3 and 4 to Contract No. DCAM-17-CS-0025B with Micon Construction, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | Council | Act A23-0031 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4010, Expires on Jun 25, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-03-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0031, Expires on Jun 25, 2019 |
2019-03-18 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 1, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-03-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-02-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |