DC B23-0180 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it establishes an On-Site Services Program to provide funding to qualifying housing providers. The on-site services include mental health services, food and nutrition services, childcare services and after-school programs among other things.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

On-site Services Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-05-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-05-23CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-03-22CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-03-15CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0180 Published in the DC Register
2019-03-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Human Services
2019-03-05CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback