DC B23-0351 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0485 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13876
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0485 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13876
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it authorizes the issuance of tax increment financing to support the Reunion Square Development project near the Anacostia Metrorail Station to transform it into a mixed use project.
Title
Reunion Square Tax Increment Financing Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Council | Act A23-0485 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13876 |
2020-11-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-16 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0485 |
2020-11-02 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 17, 2020 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-10-06 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-09-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-09-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0351 |
2020-07-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-07-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0351 Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-25 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-06-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |