DC B23-0396 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it establishes the District Waterways Management Authority and the District Waterways Management Commission to plan, manage and advocate for the diverse uses of and access to the District's waterways and adjacent property, and to require the development of a District Waterways Management Action Plan.
Title
District Waterway Management Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-12-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-07-19 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0396 Published in the DC Register |
2019-07-09 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2019-07-09 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0396 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/43046/Introduction/B23-0396-Introduction.pdf |