DC B23-0489 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced this bill establishes that intra-district transfers shall not be used to establish new programs or to circumvent allocations denied, limited, or increased by the Council in the budget act or accompanying report or mark-up sheets.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Intra-district Transfer Limitation Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-02-14CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-10-18CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0489 Published in the DC Register
2019-10-08CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2019-10-08CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback