DC B23-0528 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0574 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0574 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 23-528 establishes that rental housing assistance provided by the District government to an owner of a housing accommodation shall be considered the income of the tenant for the purposes of any minimum income qualification for rental of a dwelling unit. Among other things it prohibits owners from denying housing to a person because the person's payment is in whole or in part through a voucher for rental housing assistance.
Title
Rental Housing Source of Income Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0574 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001106 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0574 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-12-01 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-24 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0528 |
2020-02-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-01-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-12-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0528 Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2019-11-05 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |