DC B23-0640 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0577 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001112
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0577 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001112
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-640 requires the Water and Sewer Authority to allow a public comment period regarding any establishment or adjustment of retail water and sewer rates beginning on the date of publication of the notice of a public hearing. It requires a copy of Cost of Service studies be transmitted to the Mayor and Council and posted on the Authority's website. The Authority is also required to provide notice to residential customers of the requirement to dispute a contested bill in writing within 30 days. The Authority must also prescribe annual reporting requirements regarding the lead water service line replacement assistance program. The Authority must also list contact information for the DC Water Complaint line and the Office of the People's Counsel on water bills.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is "Subject to Appropriations"; please see Fiscal Impact Statement under Other Documents.
Incorporates provisions from Bill 23-836.
Title
District of Columbia Water and Sewer Authority Transparency Amendment Act of 2020 (now known as "District of Columbia Water and Sewer Authority Omnibus Amendment Act of 2020")
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-10 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-11-10 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-11-10 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-11-10 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0577 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001112 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0577 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-10 | Council | First Reading |
2020-11-10 | Council | Amendment (Cheh) |
2020-10-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-26 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0640 |
2020-07-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-07-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-07-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0640 Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2020-02-04 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |