DC B23-0866 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-21 - Act A23-0383 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9868, Expires on Nov 10, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-21 - Act A23-0383 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9868, Expires on Nov 10, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Real Property Tax Sale COVID-19 Equitable Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Real Property Tax Sale COVID-19 Equitable Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-21 | Council | Act A23-0383 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9868, Expires on Nov 10, 2020 |
2020-08-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-08-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0383, Expires on Nov 10, 2020 |
2020-08-03 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 17, 2020 |
2020-07-28 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-07-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-07-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |