DC B23-0876 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0583 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001139
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0583 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001139
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 23-876 closes a portion of Potomac Avenue, S.E., adjacent to Reservation 248 and Square South 744S, in Ward 6.
Title
Closing of a Portion of Potomac Avenue, S.E., Adjacent to Reservation 248 and Square South 744S Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0583 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001139 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0583 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-17 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0876 |
2020-10-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-09-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-09-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0876 Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |