DC B23-0971 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0481 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13856, Expires on Feb 13, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0481 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13856, Expires on Feb 13, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications to Exercise Option Year Four (4) of Contract No. CW46185 with Ramsell Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2020
Title
Modifications to Exercise Option Year Four (4) of Contract No. CW46185 with Ramsell Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Council | Act A23-0481 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13856, Expires on Feb 13, 2021 |
2020-11-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-16 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0481, Expires on Feb 13, 2021 |
2020-11-02 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 17, 2020 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-10-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-10-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |