DC B23-0972 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-972 authorizes the Rental Housing Commission to determine the annual guaranteed profit margin applicable to rent surcharges authorized by a hardship petition. It caps annual hardship petition increases to 5% and requires the Rent Administrator to review a hardship petition and to issue the housing provider and affected tenants an audit report and recommendations for the final disposition of the hardship petition within 60 days of submission. It establishes the rebuttable presumption that a housing provider has filed a petition in bad faith under certain circumstances. It establishes penalties and fines for housing providers that attempt to collect or collect a hardship rent surcharge without the prior approval of a petition or after it has expired.
Title
Hardship Petition Reform Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-11-09 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-10-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2020-10-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-16 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0972 Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0972 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/45806/Introduction/B23-0972-Introduction.pdf |