DC B23-1007 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0596 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001193, Expires on Apr 12, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0596 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001193, Expires on Apr 12, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reverse Mortgage Insurance and Tax Payment Program Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Reverse Mortgage Insurance and Tax Payment Program Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0596 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001193, Expires on Apr 12, 2021 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0596, Expires on Apr 12, 2021 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-12-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-11-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |