DC B23-1010 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0597 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001195, Expires on Apr 12, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0597 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001195, Expires on Apr 12, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 11, 12, and 13 to Contract No. DCAM-18-CS-0054 with Turner Construction Company Approval and Payment Au thorization Emergency Act of 2020
Title
Modification Nos. 11, 12, and 13 to Contract No. DCAM-18-CS-0054 with Turner Construction Company Approval and Payment Au thorization Emergency Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0597 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001195, Expires on Apr 12, 2021 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0597, Expires on Apr 12, 2021 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-12-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-11-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |