DC B25-0074 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - Law L25-0065, Effective from Nov 28, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015600
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - Law L25-0065, Effective from Nov 28, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015600
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-74 would clarify that landlords may not charge over a certain amount for fees associated with processing applications for rental housing and raises the notice period for rent increases from 30 days to 60 days. It retains the landlord’s ability to withhold a security deposit for the replacement value of items a tenant may have damaged during their lease but prohibits charging new or departing tenants with fees associated with maintaining the implied warranty of habitability in a unit.
Title
Fairness in Renting Clarification Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Zachary Parker [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-19 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Council - CM R. White - Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Council - CM R. White - Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-08 | Council | Law L25-0065, Effective from Nov 28, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015600 |
2023-10-20 | Council | Act A25-0248 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013822 |
2023-10-13 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-10-12 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-10-11 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0248 |
2023-09-27 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 12, 2023 |
2023-09-19 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-09-19 | Council | CM R. White - Amendment |
2023-07-11 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2023-06-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-06-22 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-06-22 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0074 |
2023-05-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-03-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing |
2023-02-03 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0074 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |