DC B25-0135 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-135 would include appliances and tires within the definition of solid waste and codify the Attorney General for the District of Columbia’s criminal enforcement authority. It would also allow the Attorney General for the District of Columbia to commence appropriate civil actions for damages, civil penalties, cost recovery, attorney and expert witness fees, and injunctive or other appropriate relief.
Title
Illegal Dumping Enforcement Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Zachary Parker [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] |
Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Matthew Frumin [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-06-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-06-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-09 | Council | Referred to Committee on Public Works and Operations |
2023-06-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Public Works and Operations |
2023-05-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0135 Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-02-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0135 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52335/Introduction/B25-0135-Introduction.pdf |