DC B25-0350 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Recommitted to Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Recommitted to Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-350 would designate the school in Lot 0899 in Square 1356, bounded by MacArthur Boulevard, N.W., Q St. N.W., Clark Place N.W., and Laverock Place N.W., as MacArthur High School.
Title
MacArthur High School Designation Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Council - RECOMMITTED BACK TO COMMITTEE (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Council - First Reading (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Council - First Reading (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | Council | Recommitted to Committee |
2024-01-09 | Council | First Reading |
2023-11-28 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-10-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-10-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-07-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0350 Published in the DC Register |
2023-07-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-06-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |