DC B25-0591 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on December 20 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-01-12 - Act A25-0346 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000657, Expires on Apr 03, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 20 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-01-12 - Act A25-0346 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000657, Expires on Apr 03, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023
Title
Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-12-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-12 | Council | Act A25-0346 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000657, Expires on Apr 03, 2024 |
2024-01-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-01-04 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0346, Expires on Apr 03, 2024 |
2023-12-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 5, 2024 |
2023-12-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-12-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-12-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |