DC B25-0669 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Unlawful Restrictions in Land Records Act of 2024
Title
Uniform Unlawful Restrictions in Land Records Act of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-02-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-01-26 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0669 Published in the DC Register |
2024-01-23 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0669 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54614/Introduction/B25-0669-Introduction.pdf |