DC B25-0688 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Act A25-0405 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 002246, Expires on May 29, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Act A25-0405 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 002246, Expires on May 29, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Historic Preservation of Derelict District Properties Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Historic Preservation of Derelict District Properties Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Council | Act A25-0405 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 002246, Expires on May 29, 2024 |
2024-02-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-02-29 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0405, Expires on May 29, 2024 |
2024-02-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 29, 2024 |
2024-02-06 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-02-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-02-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |