DC B25-0699 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. DCCB-2024-F-0010 with Tycko & Zavareei LLP Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2024
Title
Contract No. DCCB-2024-F-0010 with Tycko & Zavareei LLP Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-04-12 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0438, Expires on Jul 11, 2024 |
2024-04-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 22, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-03-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-02-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |