DC B25-0734 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Jun 14, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Jun 14, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Opioid Crisis and Juvenile Crime Public Emergencies Extension Authorization Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Opioid Crisis and Juvenile Crime Public Emergencies Extension Authorization Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Jun 14, 2024 |
2024-04-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-04-15 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0456 |
2024-04-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 22, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-03-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0734 Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-05 | Council | First Reading |
2024-03-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-03-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |