DC CER20-0047 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Resolution ACR20-0047 Effective from May 7, 2013 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 8438
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Resolution ACR20-0047 Effective from May 7, 2013 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 8438
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
May 17, 2013 Bike To Work Day Recognition Resolution Of 2013
Title
May 17, 2013 Bike To Work Day Recognition Resolution Of 2013
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Council | Resolution ACR20-0047 Effective from May 7, 2013 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 8438 |
2013-05-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2013-05-03 | Council | CER20-0047 Introduced by Councilmember Bowser at Office of the Secretary |