DC CER20-0197 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Resolution ACR20-0197 Effective from May 6, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 8705
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Resolution ACR20-0197 Effective from May 6, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 8705
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nurses Week In The District Of Columbia Recognition Resolution Of 2014
Title
Nurses Week In The District Of Columbia Recognition Resolution Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-22 | Council | Resolution ACR20-0197 Effective from May 6, 2014 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 8705 |
2014-05-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2014-05-05 | Council | CER20-0197 Introduced by Councilmember Alexander at Office of the Secretary |