DC CER21-0263 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-21 - Resolution ACR21-0263 Effective from September 20, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 13011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-21 - Resolution ACR21-0263 Effective from September 20, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 13011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Superior Court Of The District Of Columbia Chief Judge Lee F. Satterfield Recognition Resolution Of 2016
Title
Superior Court Of The District Of Columbia Chief Judge Lee F. Satterfield Recognition Resolution Of 2016
Sponsors
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-09-20 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-21 | Council | Resolution ACR21-0263 Effective from September 20, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 13011 |
2016-09-20 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR21-0263 |
2016-09-20 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-09-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-09-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |