DC CER21-0278 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-28 - Resolution ACR21-0278 Effective from October 11, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 13367
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-28 - Resolution ACR21-0278 Effective from October 11, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 13367
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
District Of Columbia Week Of Non-violence Recognition Resolution Of 2016
Title
District Of Columbia Week Of Non-violence Recognition Resolution Of 2016
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-28 | Council | Resolution ACR21-0278 Effective from October 11, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 13367 |
2016-10-11 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR21-0278 |
2016-10-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/CER21-0278 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/36723/CER21-0278-Introduction.pdf |